Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Conference granted, SCs named Rogers, Rosino, Haste, Pemberton, Prieto, Montgomery, Young
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
SA's rejected, conference requested, conferees to be named later
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 33 Nays: 7
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Title restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
General Order, Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 87 Nays: 6
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Amended
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
Authored by Senator Rogers (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
CR; Do Pass Public Health Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Public Health
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Representative Stinson
|
|
|