Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB2787 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 19, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 24, 2023
Bill March 27, 2023

Amended

Bill April 17, 2023
Bill February 20, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 13, 2023