House
|
04/26/2023
|
Approved by Governor 04/26/2023
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 3
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 10
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Authored by Senator Rogers (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
CR; Do Pass Business and Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Representative Stinson
|
|
|