Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB2788 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 19, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 8, 2023

Enrolled

Bill April 20, 2023

Amended

Bill April 17, 2023
Bill February 23, 2023