Senate | 04/06/2023 | Referred to Appropriations | ||
Senate | 04/06/2023 | Title stricken | ||
Senate | 04/06/2023 | Reported Do Pass as amended General Government committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | Second Reading referred to General Government Committee then to Appropriations Committee | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 64 Nays: 26 | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Amended by floor substitute | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | General Order | ||
House | 02/20/2023 | Authored by Senator Thompson (Roger) (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 02/20/2023 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Representative Wallace |