House
|
05/16/2024
|
HC's named: Conference Committee on Business and Commerce
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2024
|
Conference granted, SCs named Gollihare, Coleman, Thompson (Kristen), Haste, Seifried, Newhouse, Brooks
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
SA's rejected, conference requested, conferees to be named later
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2024
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2024
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 2
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2024
|
Enacting clause stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2024
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2024
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Business and Commerce committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
Authored by Senator Gollihare (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Business and Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
Referred to Business and Commerce
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
Withdrawn from Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2024
|
Authored by Representative Dobrinski
|
|
|