Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB3107 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 16, 2024

Engrossed

Bill April 29, 2024
Bill March 13, 2024

Amended

Bill April 9, 2024
Bill March 3, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill February 28, 2024