Senate | 03/28/2024 | Reported Do Pass General Government committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 03/19/2024 | Second Reading referred to General Government | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/13/2024 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 68 Nays: 18 | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | General Order | ||
House | 02/29/2024 | Emergency added | ||
House | 02/29/2024 | Authored by Senator Hall (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 02/29/2024 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee | ||
House | 02/19/2024 | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Select Agencies Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Select Agencies Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | ||
House | 02/05/2024 | Authored by Representative Kerbs |