Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB3192 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 17, 2024

Engrossed

Bill February 20, 2024

Enrolled

Bill April 23, 2024

Amended

Bill April 9, 2024
Bill February 11, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill February 7, 2024