House | 05/06/2024 | Approved by Governor 05/03/2024 | ||
House | 05/01/2024 | Sent to Governor | ||
Senate | 05/01/2024 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | ||
House | 05/01/2024 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | ||
House | 04/30/2024 | Referred for enrollment | ||
House | 04/30/2024 | Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 67 Nays: 12 | ||
House | 04/30/2024 | SA's read, adopted | ||
House | 04/18/2024 | SA's received | ||
Senate | 04/18/2024 | Engrossed to House | ||
Senate | 04/17/2024 | Measure passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 4 | ||
Senate | 04/17/2024 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 04/17/2024 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 04/08/2024 | Reported Do Pass as amended Business and Commerce committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 03/19/2024 | Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/12/2024 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/11/2024 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 73 Nays: 20 | ||
House | 03/11/2024 | General Order | ||
House | 02/19/2024 | Authored by Senator Daniels (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 02/19/2024 | CR; Do Pass Business and Commerce Committee | ||
House | 02/05/2024 | Authored by Representative West (Kevin) |