Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB3215 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 17, 2024

Engrossed

Bill April 18, 2024
Bill March 12, 2024

Enrolled

Bill May 1, 2024

Amended

Bill April 9, 2024
Bill February 19, 2024