House
|
05/13/2024
|
Approved by Governor 05/13/2024
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2024
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2024
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2024
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2024
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2024
|
Fourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 82 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Hefner, Pittman
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2024
|
SA's read, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2024
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2024
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2024
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2024
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2024
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2024
|
Emergency added
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2024
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative Waldron
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 84 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
Authored by Senator Garvin (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
CR; Do Pass Children, Youth and Family Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Referred to Children, Youth and Family Services
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Withdrawn from Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Withdrawn from Children, Youth and Family Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Children, Youth and Family Services
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2024
|
Authored by Representative Lawson
|
|
|