Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB3238 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 17, 2024

Engrossed

Bill April 23, 2024
Bill March 6, 2024

Enrolled

Bill May 8, 2024

Amended

Bill April 15, 2024
Bill March 3, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill April 11, 2024