House | 04/23/2024 | Vetoed 04/23/2024 | ||
House | 04/18/2024 | Sent to Governor | ||
Senate | 04/18/2024 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | ||
House | 04/18/2024 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | ||
House | 04/17/2024 | Referred for enrollment | ||
Senate | 04/17/2024 | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House | ||
Senate | 04/17/2024 | Measure passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 2 | ||
Senate | 04/17/2024 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 04/04/2024 | Reported Do Pass General Government committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 03/19/2024 | Second Reading referred to General Government | ||
House | 03/06/2024 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/06/2024 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/05/2024 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/05/2024 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 81 Nays: 2 | ||
House | 03/05/2024 | General Order | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | Authored by Senator Hall (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | ||
House | 02/05/2024 | Authored by Representative Hilbert |