House
|
05/06/2024
|
Approved by Governor 05/03/2024
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2024
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2024
|
Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 72 Nays: 2
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2024
|
SA's read, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 34 Nays: 9
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2024
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Business and Commerce committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative Deck
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 87 Nays: 7
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Authored by Senator Kirt (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) McEntire
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
CR; Do Pass Business and Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2024
|
Authored by Representative Archer
|
|
|