Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB3428 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 17, 2024

Engrossed

Bill April 25, 2024
Bill March 5, 2024

Enrolled

Bill May 1, 2024

Amended

Bill April 2, 2024
Bill February 24, 2024