House
|
04/29/2024
|
Approved by Governor 04/29/2024
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2024
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Amendment restored bill to engrossed version
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Title restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
General Order, Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2024
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2024
|
Reported Do Pass as amended General Government committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2024
|
Second Reading referred to General Government
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 98 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Authored by Senator Pugh (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute General Government Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2024
|
Authored by Representative Archer
|
|
|