Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB3430 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 17, 2024

Engrossed

Bill February 22, 2024

Enrolled

Bill April 25, 2024

Amended

Bill April 15, 2024
Bill February 7, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill February 6, 2024