House
|
04/29/2024
|
Approved by Governor 04/26/2024
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2024
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2024
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2024
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2024
|
Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2024
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2024
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Judiciary
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Amended
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
House Rule suspended
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Authored by Senator Howard (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Conley, Bashore, West (Kevin), Baker, Kerbs
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
CR; Do Pass Judiciary - Criminal Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Criminal
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2024
|
Authored by Representative Moore
|
|
|