Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB3456 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 18, 2024

Engrossed

Bill March 5, 2024

Enrolled

Bill April 24, 2024

Amended

Bill April 10, 2024
Bill February 18, 2024