Senate | 04/18/2024 | Title stricken | ||
Senate | 04/18/2024 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 03/27/2024 | Referred to Appropriations | ||
Senate | 03/27/2024 | Reported Do Pass Veterans and Military Affairs committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 03/19/2024 | Second Reading referred to Veterans and Military Affairs Committee then to Appropriations Committee | ||
House | 03/06/2024 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/06/2024 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/05/2024 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/05/2024 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 2 | ||
House | 03/05/2024 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Luttrell | ||
House | 03/05/2024 | General Order | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | Authored by Senator Hall (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | ||
House | 02/05/2024 | Authored by Representative Kannady |