Senate | 03/25/2024 | Reported Do Pass Agriculture and Rural Affairs committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 03/19/2024 | Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Rural Affairs | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/12/2024 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/11/2024 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/11/2024 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 72 Nays: 22 | ||
House | 03/11/2024 | Authored by Senator Pederson (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/11/2024 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Menz, Hardin, Burns, Lowe (Dick), Archer, Pfeiffer, Hefner | ||
House | 03/11/2024 | General Order | ||
House | 02/15/2024 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Tourism Committee | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | Second Reading referred to Tourism | ||
House | 02/05/2024 | Authored by Representative Alonso-Sandoval |