Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB3822 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 18, 2024

Engrossed

Bill March 12, 2024

Amended

Bill March 26, 2024
Bill February 19, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill February 15, 2024