Senate | 04/18/2024 | Placed on General Order | ||
Senate | 04/18/2024 | Withdrawn from Appropriations committee | ||
Senate | 04/09/2024 | Referred to Appropriations | ||
Senate | 04/09/2024 | Title stricken | ||
Senate | 04/09/2024 | Reported Do Pass as amended Education committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 03/19/2024 | Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee | ||
House | 03/11/2024 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/11/2024 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/07/2024 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/07/2024 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 0 | ||
House | 03/07/2024 | General Order | ||
House | 02/27/2024 | Authored by Senator Weaver (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 02/27/2024 | CR; Do Pass Common Education Committee | ||
House | 02/15/2024 | Referred to Common Education | ||
House | 02/15/2024 | Withdrawn from Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | Second Reading referred to Rules | ||
House | 02/05/2024 | Authored by Representative Ford |