House
|
05/30/2024
|
Approved by Governor 05/31/2024
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2024
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2024
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2024
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2024
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2024
|
Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 42 Nays: 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2024
|
CCR adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2024
|
CCR read
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2024
|
To Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2024
|
Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 82 Nays: 2
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2024
|
CCR submitted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2024
|
Conference granted, SCs named Pugh, Howard, Gollihare, Standridge, Weaver, Floyd
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2024
|
HC's named: Conference Committee on Judiciary - Civil
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2024
|
SA's rejected, conference requested, conferees to be named later
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2024
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 35 Nays: 9
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Judiciary
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2024
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 1
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Amended by floor substitute
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
House Rule suspended
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Authored by Senator Pugh (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Kane
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2024
|
CR; Do Pass Judiciary - Civil Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Civil
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2024
|
Authored by Representative Echols
|
|
|