Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB3962 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 18, 2024

Engrossed

Bill April 17, 2024
Bill March 18, 2024

Enrolled

Bill May 30, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill May 21, 2024
Bill April 9, 2024

Amended

Bill April 10, 2024
Bill February 15, 2024