Senate
|
05/30/2024
|
2 CCR read
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2024
|
To Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2024
|
Fourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 95 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2024
|
2 CCR adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2024
|
Coauthored by Senator(s) Bullard
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2024
|
Remove Senator Bullard as principal Senate author and substitute with Senator Thompson (Roger)
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2024
|
2 CCR submitted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2024
|
Further conference granted, same conferees
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2024
|
CCR rejected, further conference requested, same conferees
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2024
|
Title restored
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2024
|
Remove as coauthor Representative(s) Alonso-Sandoval, Hefner, Pittman
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2024
|
Remove Senator Thompson (Roger) as principal Senate author and substitute with Senator Bullard
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2024
|
CCR submitted
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2024
|
HC's named: GCCA
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2024
|
Conference granted, SCs named Thompson (Roger), Bullard, Pederson, Garvin, Gollihare, Dossett
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2024
|
SA's rejected, conference requested, conferees to be named later
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 4
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2024
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2024
|
Reported Do Pass Tourism and Wildlife committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Tourism and Wildlife Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative Alonso-Sandoval
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative Pittman
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 87 Nays: 2
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Hefner, Cantrell, Townley
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Authored by Senator Thompson (Roger) (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2024
|
Authored by Representative Echols
|
|
|