Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB3972 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 18, 2024

Engrossed

Bill April 25, 2024
Bill March 5, 2024

Amended

Bill April 22, 2024
Bill February 19, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill May 29, 2024
Bill May 28, 2024
Bill February 15, 2024