Senate
|
05/09/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative Wolfley
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2024
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2024
|
Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative Fugate
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 79 Nays: 16
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Waldron
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Emergency added
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Authored by Senator Pugh (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Baker
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2024
|
Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Referred to Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Referred to Appropriations and Budget
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Withdrawn from Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2024
|
Authored by Representative McBride
|
|
|