House
|
05/30/2024
|
Approved by Governor 06/14/2024
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2024
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2024
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2024
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2024
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2024
|
Measure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2024
|
CCR adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2024
|
CCR read
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2024
|
To Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2024
|
Fourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2024
|
CCR submitted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2024
|
Conference granted, SCs named Weaver, Pugh, Hall, Treat, McCortney, Floyd
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2024
|
HC's named: GCCA
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2024
|
SA's rejected, conference requested, conferees to be named later
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2024
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2024
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2024
|
Coauthored by Senator Coleman
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Education committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative Waldron
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2024
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Amended
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
House Rule suspended
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Authored by Senator Weaver (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2024
|
Authored by Representative Wallace
|
|
|