LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Oklahoma OK
Legislatures
2024 Regular Session
House
Bills
HB4073
Draft Versions
OK
Oklahoma House Bill HB4073
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session
Oklahoma House Bill HB4073
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Bill
January 18, 2024
Compare
Engrossed
Bill
April 29, 2024
Compare
Bill
March 11, 2024
Compare
Enrolled
Bill
May 30, 2024
Compare
Amended
Bill
April 10, 2024
Compare
Bill
March 3, 2024
Compare
Comm Sub
Bill
April 9, 2024
Compare