House
|
05/01/2023
|
Filed with Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Returned by Governor (4/28/2023)
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 31 Nays: 11
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Reported Do Pass Rules committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Prieto
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Hamilton
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Daniels
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Rogers
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Newhouse
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Pederson
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Pemberton
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Stephens
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Burns
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Bullard
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 59 Nays: 34
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Sims
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Authored by Senator Bergstrom (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Lawson, Hardin, Boles, Lepak, Maynard, Caldwell (Chad), West (Kevin), CrosswhiteHader, Dollens, Dobrinski, George, Stinson, Williams, Humphrey, West (Rick), Alonso-Sandoval, Martinez, Boatman
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
CR; Do Pass Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Representative Echols
|
|
|