Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HJR1032 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 19, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 22, 2023

Enrolled

Bill April 24, 2023

Amended

Bill April 17, 2023
Bill March 4, 2023