Senate
|
05/29/2024
|
Filed with Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2024
|
To Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2024
|
Veto overridden: Ayes: 83 Nays: 4
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2024
|
Veto override message received
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2024
|
Measure sent to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2024
|
Veto overridden: Ayes: 35 Nays: 9
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2024
|
Vetoed 05/21/2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
Signed, returned to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
Enrolled, to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2024
|
Coauthored by Senator Stephens
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2024
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2024
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 6
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2024
|
HAs adopted AYES: 36 NAYS: 9
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
HAs read
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 82 Nays: 6
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Moore, Hays, Hefner
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
Emergency removed
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Sneed, Munson, Provenzano, West (Josh), Sterling, Schreiber, Harris
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary - Civil Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Civil
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2024
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Emergency passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 4
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Emergency added
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative Bashore (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2023
|
Referred to Legislative Actuary under 62 O.S., Section 3108
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2023
|
Amended by Committee Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Hamilton
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Senator Garvin
|
|
|