Senate | 05/05/2023 | Approved by Governor 05/05/2023 | ||
Senate | 05/01/2023 | Sent to Governor | ||
Senate | 05/01/2023 | Enrolled, to House | ||
House | 05/01/2023 | Signed, returned to Senate | ||
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Referred for enrollment | ||
House | 04/27/2023 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 75 Nays: 0 | ||
House | 04/27/2023 | General Order | ||
House | 04/03/2023 | CR; Do Pass Banking, Financial Services and Pensions Committee | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Second Reading referred to Banking, Financial Services and Pensions | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 1 | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | Emergency added | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | General Order, Amended | ||
Senate | 02/23/2023 | Coauthored by Representative Munson (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/14/2023 | Reported Do Pass as amended Judiciary committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Senator Floyd |