Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1091 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 19, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 23, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 1, 2023

Amended

Bill April 4, 2023
Bill February 15, 2023