House | 04/10/2024 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary - Criminal Committee | ||
House | 04/02/2024 | Referred to Judiciary - Criminal | ||
House | 04/02/2024 | Withdrawn from Public Safety Committee | ||
House | 03/25/2024 | Second Reading referred to Public Safety | ||
Senate | 03/18/2024 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/18/2024 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | Measure passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 8 | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute | ||
Senate | 03/11/2024 | Remove as principal author Representative Hill and substitute with Representative Bashore | ||
Senate | 03/11/2024 | Remove as principal author Representative Bashore and substitute with Representative Hill | ||
Senate | 03/07/2024 | Placed on General Order | ||
Senate | 03/07/2024 | Withdrawn from Appropriations committee | ||
Senate | 02/29/2024 | Referred to Appropriations | ||
Senate | 02/29/2024 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/15/2023 | Coauthored by Representative Bashore (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Public Safety Committee then to Appropriations Committee | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Senator Rosino |