Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1100 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 19, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 18, 2024

Amended

Bill April 10, 2024
Bill March 7, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill April 10, 2024
Bill February 29, 2024