Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
SCs named Thompson (Roger), Pugh, Seifried, Daniels, Dossett, Pemberton, Rader
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
HAs rejected, conference requested
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
HAs read
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 84 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Schreiber
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Referred to Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 47 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Baker (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
Reported Do Pass Appropriations committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Education committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Senator Thompson (Roger)
|
|
|