Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB112 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 3, 2023

Engrossed

Bill May 1, 2023
Bill March 23, 2023

Amended

Bill April 21, 2023
Bill March 2, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 19, 2023