House | 04/18/2024 | Enacting clause stricken | ||
House | 04/18/2024 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee | ||
House | 04/08/2024 | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/27/2024 | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/27/2024 | Referred to Appropriations and Budget | ||
House | 03/27/2024 | Withdrawn from Common Education Committee | ||
House | 03/25/2024 | Second Reading referred to Common Education | ||
Senate | 03/13/2024 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/12/2024 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/12/2024 | Measure passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 8 | ||
Senate | 03/12/2024 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 03/04/2024 | Coauthored by Representative Lepak (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/27/2024 | Title stricken | ||
Senate | 02/27/2024 | Reported Do Pass as amended Education committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Second Reading referred to Education | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | Coauthored by Senator Jett | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | Authored by Senator Bergstrom |