Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1198 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill October 19, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 13, 2024

Amended

Bill April 19, 2024
Bill February 28, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill April 18, 2024