Senate | 04/30/2024 | Approved by Governor 04/30/2024 | ||
Senate | 04/25/2024 | Sent to Governor | ||
Senate | 04/25/2024 | Enrolled, to House | ||
House | 04/25/2024 | Signed, returned to Senate | ||
Senate | 04/24/2024 | Referred for enrollment | ||
House | 04/24/2024 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 94 Nays: 0 | ||
House | 04/24/2024 | General Order | ||
House | 04/02/2024 | CR; Do Pass Public Safety Committee | ||
House | 03/25/2024 | Second Reading referred to Public Safety | ||
Senate | 02/19/2024 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 02/19/2024 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 02/15/2024 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 02/15/2024 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 | ||
Senate | 02/15/2024 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 02/13/2024 | Reported Do Pass Aeronautics and Transportation committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Second Reading referred to Aeronautics and Transportation | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | Coauthored by Representative Dobrinski (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | Authored by Senator Pederson |