Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1209 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 30, 2023

Engrossed

Bill February 19, 2024

Enrolled

Bill April 25, 2024

Amended

Bill April 4, 2024
Bill February 14, 2024