House | 05/30/2024 | Veto overrride failed: Ayes: 63 Nays: 20 | ||
House | 05/30/2024 | Veto override message received | ||
Senate | 05/30/2024 | Measure sent to House | ||
Senate | 05/30/2024 | Veto overridden: Ayes: 37 Nays: 7 | ||
Senate | 04/23/2024 | Vetoed 04/23/2024 | ||
Senate | 04/17/2024 | Sent to Governor | ||
Senate | 04/17/2024 | Enrolled, to House | ||
House | 04/17/2024 | Signed, returned to Senate | ||
Senate | 04/16/2024 | Referred for enrollment | ||
House | 04/16/2024 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 1 | ||
House | 04/16/2024 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Swope | ||
House | 04/16/2024 | General Order | ||
House | 04/02/2024 | CR; Do Pass Public Safety Committee | ||
House | 03/25/2024 | Second Reading referred to Public Safety | ||
Senate | 03/06/2024 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/06/2024 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/05/2024 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/05/2024 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 36 Nays: 7 | ||
Senate | 03/05/2024 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 02/22/2024 | Reported Do Pass General Government committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Coauthored by Representative Kannady (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Second Reading referred to General Government | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | Authored by Senator Stanley |