Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1210 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 30, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 6, 2024

Enrolled

Bill April 17, 2024

Amended

Bill April 4, 2024
Bill February 26, 2024