House
|
05/29/2024
|
CCR submitted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2024
|
Measure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 41 Nays: 2
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2024
|
CCR adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2024
|
Enacting clause restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2024
|
Title restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2024
|
CCR read
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2024
|
Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Administrative Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2024
|
SCs named Bergstrom, Daniels, Garvin, Pemberton, Coleman, Matthews
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2024
|
HAs rejected, conference requested
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2024
|
HAs read
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 87 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2024
|
Enacting clause stricken
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2024
|
CR; Do Pass, as amended, Administrative Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Administrative Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2024
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 33 Nays: 6
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
General Order, Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2024
|
Reported Do Pass Administrative Rules committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative Kendrix (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
Authored by Senator Bergstrom
|
|
|