Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1233 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 7, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 17, 2024
Bill March 11, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill May 28, 2024

Amended

Bill March 28, 2024
Bill February 8, 2024