Senate | 04/18/2024 | Approved by Governor 04/18/2024 | ||
Senate | 04/16/2024 | Sent to Governor | ||
Senate | 04/16/2024 | Enrolled, to House | ||
House | 04/16/2024 | Signed, returned to Senate | ||
Senate | 04/15/2024 | Referred for enrollment | ||
House | 04/15/2024 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 0 | ||
House | 04/15/2024 | General Order | ||
House | 03/28/2024 | CR; Do Pass Administrative Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/25/2024 | Second Reading referred to Administrative Rules | ||
Senate | 03/06/2024 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/06/2024 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/05/2024 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/05/2024 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 36 Nays: 5 | ||
Senate | 03/05/2024 | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute | ||
Senate | 02/07/2024 | Reported Do Pass Administrative Rules committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | Coauthored by Representative Kendrix (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | Authored by Senator Bergstrom |