Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1235 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 7, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 6, 2024

Enrolled

Bill April 16, 2024

Amended

Bill March 28, 2024
Bill February 8, 2024